Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
One (1) day notice, Friday, 04-26-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 719) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-19-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported from GVO/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3872) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-24 3:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to GVO/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 462).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1384-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:15AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to AGR, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|