Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
One (1) day notice, Friday, 04-26-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 753) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-22-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3910) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS deferred the measure until 04-17-24 8:45AM; Conference Room 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 638).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1644-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1536-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|