House
|
04/22/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 754).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-22-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3908) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to PSM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 641).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1723-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|