House
|
04/22/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 757) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-22-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3913) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to EET.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 647).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1730-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1413-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:31AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|