House
|
04/25/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 789).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-25-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported from CPN/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3924) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-24 9:35AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to CPN/HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 649).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1677-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1442-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|