House
|
04/22/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 735).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-22-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported from LBT/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3885) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
The committee(s) on LBT/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Re-Referred to LBT/GVO.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to LBT/PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 600).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1733-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1397-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-19-24 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|