House | 03/25/2024 | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3). | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1365-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 17 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Offered | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | To be offered. |