Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 826).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
One (1) day notice, Friday, 04-26-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 736) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-22-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3905) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM has rescheduled its public hearing to 04-17-24 3:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-24 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 460).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1388-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:00AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Referred to CMV, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|