House
|
04/25/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 786).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-25-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported from CPN/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3923) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-24 9:35AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to CPN/HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 603).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1726-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1467-24), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Referred to HUS, CPC, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|