Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 737) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-22-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported from TCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3916) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Re-Referred to TCA/GVO.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Referred to TCA/PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 480).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1540-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-21-24 10:30AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Referred to TRN, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|