Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to PSM/WTL.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 459).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evslin, Garrett, Kila, Lamosao, Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (7).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from LGO/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1353-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by LGO/WAL on Tuesday, 03-19-24 9:05AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Referred to LGO/WAL, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|