House
|
04/18/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 693).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-18-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported from PSM/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3861) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to PSM/HOU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 461).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1386-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:00AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Referred to CMV, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|