Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 591).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1687-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1430-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-19-24 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|