House
|
04/22/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 742).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-22-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3890) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to HOU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 471).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Amato, Hussey-Burdick, Perruso, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Gates, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Sayama, Tam excused (9).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1448-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Onishi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to HSG, referral sheet 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|