House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1416-24), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|