House | 03/28/2024 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1546-24), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred to HUS, referral sheet 22 | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Offered |