House | 03/25/2024 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3). | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1383-24), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:15AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred to AGR, referral sheet 22 | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Offered |