House
|
04/04/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1641-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-24 11:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-24 at 11:15 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|