House | 04/04/2024 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1722-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Souza. | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 22 | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Offered |