House
|
04/04/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1729-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1412-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:31AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|