House | 03/27/2024 | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9). | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1410-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Ward. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:31AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 17 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Offered | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | To be offered. |