House | 03/25/2024 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3). | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1387-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:00AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Referred to CMV, referral sheet 18 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Offered | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | To be offered. |