House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9).
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1424-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-19-24 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|