House | 03/27/2024 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Amato, Hussey-Burdick, Perruso, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Gates, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Sayama, Tam excused (9). | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1447-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Onishi. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to HSG, referral sheet 21 | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Offered | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | To be offered. |