House
|
04/04/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1697-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1468-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-21-24 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|