House | 03/27/2024 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Gates, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Sayama, Tam excused (9). | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1449-24), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama. | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:30AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to CAI, referral sheet 21 | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Offered | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | To be offered. |