House | 03/28/2024 | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Amato, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kapela, Perruso, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1523-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, La Chica, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Quinlan. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 21 | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Offered | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | To be offered. |