House
|
04/04/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Marten voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Amato, Belatti, Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, La Chica, Lowen, Matsumoto, Perruso, Poepoe, Ward voting no (14) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1742-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Cochran, Poepoe; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 25
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to TRN/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|