12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Reported from WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 12) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Referred to WTL/HWN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Pending Introduction. |