Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-23 2:06PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Lee Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Hashem, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 611).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Pierick voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1916), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-29-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Pierick voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pierick; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:30PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 338) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1128) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:20AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 617) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 9:31AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Re-Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to EET/CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|