12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Referred to EDU/EET, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |