House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; San Buenaventura Co-Chair; Kanuha.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 589).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Evslin, Ganaden, Garrett, Perruso voting no (5) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1925), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1366) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Evslin, Kapela, La Chica, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 38) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-03-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 712) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 284) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to EDU, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|