12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | The committee(s) on LBT deferred the measure until 02-10-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Referred to LBT, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |