Senate | 02/16/2024 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2646) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). | ||
12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee on TCA deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Referred to TCA, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |