|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1281) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, La Chica, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 88) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 948) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 274) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 9:05AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|