House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Elefante Co-Chair; Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 771).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2113) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Poepoe, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1443) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Sayama, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 366).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 844) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 323) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|