12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 81) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 02-03-23 2:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Pending Introduction. |