12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 2:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Referred to HHS/HOU, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |