12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-16-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 229. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-09-23 9:30AM; CR 229. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to CPN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |