12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to AEN/PSM, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |