12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 9:50AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from WTL/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to WTL/TCA, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |