12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 541) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to LBT, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |