12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 584) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 9:31AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to CPN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |