12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 4:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to PSM/LBT, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |