12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to WTL, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |