12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Re-Referred to CPN, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Referred to CPN/PSM, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Pending Introduction. |