12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on EDU/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 3:45PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to EDU/HHS, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |