12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-16-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to GVO, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |