12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from TCA/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 446) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to TCA/EET, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |