|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1554) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 470) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 962) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 493) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-14-23 3:00PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|